Financial history FUTURES UNLOCKED

Charity number: 1116271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £110.19k £96.08k £137.13k £123.36k £126.43k
Total expenditure £160.26k £121.18k £123.76k £118.01k £96.61k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £13.26k £13.26k £6.63k
Income from government grants £25.24k £19.50k £106.44k £96.75k £106.44k