Financial history THAMIL COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1117267
Charity reporting is overdue by 807 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.91k £1.75k £2.30k £2.71k £2.97k
Total expenditure £1.79k £1.73k £2.27k £2.61k £2.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A