Accounts and annual returns BOBI WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1117420
Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 353 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 353 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 December 2021 182 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required