Accounts and annual returns SUFFOLK OPERA

Charity number: 1116235
Charity reporting is overdue by 1328 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 232 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Overdue by 232 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 597 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 597 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 963 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 963 days
Annual return 05 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1328 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1328 days
Annual return 05 April 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required