Financial history SUFFOLK OPERA

Charity number: 1116235
Charity reporting is overdue by 1340 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017
Total gross income £13.15k £5.37k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £13.77k £5.37k £80 £80 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0