BELLE VUE YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 1118126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.76k £9.64k £15.47k £17.69k £16.47k
Total expenditure £10.68k £8.18k £16.53k £13.06k £15.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £350 N/A N/A