SGA COMMUNITY SERVICES LTD

Charity number: 1119486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £33.94k £32.64k £249.49k £249.49k £258.94k
Total expenditure £31.76k £31.40k £243.87k £243.87k £241.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A