Financial history CHRIST THE ROCK INTERNATIONAL MINISTRY

Charity number: 1120229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £24.50k £18.86k £23.10k £18.46k £20.69k
Total expenditure £20.37k £15.53k £14.91k £20.35k £23.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A