FOUR PAWS

Charity number: 1118102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 May 2017 On time Download