FOUR PAWS

Charity number: 1118102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.09m £2.59m £2.51m £2.65m £3.77m
Total expenditure £2.19m £2.54m £2.35m £2.84m £3.42m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.09m £2.59m £2.51m £2.65m £3.77m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £191.19k £606.77k £447.98k £240.64k £587.11k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.32m £1.56m £1.43m £1.94m £2.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £864.48k £983.49k £921.67k £900.85k £1.04m
Expenditure - Governance £7.44k £0 £0 £8.99k £12.42k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £197.50k £733.26k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0