Accounts and annual returns TARGETCRAFT ARCHERS

Charity number: 1118371
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 March 2022 230 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 11 August 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required