IREBY PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money to help finance extra curricular activities for Ireby School children through local events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 17 October 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Branthwaite | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Chadwick | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chris Wynn | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/07/2019 | 25/07/2020 | 25/07/2021 | 25/07/2022 | 25/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.03k | £2.37k | £2.53k | £2.32k | £20.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.85k | £637 | £2.21k | £3.07k | £2.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 July 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 July 2022 | 20 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 July 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 July 2020 | 14 September 2021 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 25 July 2019 | 07 June 2021 | 378 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 MARCH 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY (1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; (2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ireby C Of E School
Ireby
WIGTON
Cumbria
CA7 1DS
- Phone:
- 01697371367
- Email:
- office@ireby.cumbria.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window