Trustees LONDON TRANSPORT MUSEUM LIMITED
Charity number: 1123122

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR Keith Ludeman | Chair | 26 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lilli Matson | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Helen Creagh | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Obinna Vincent Nwofor | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Major | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Elizabeth Rosser | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Winsome Hull | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Stephen Ferris | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Arthur | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JONATHAN SMITH | Trustee | 17 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Liz Alana Williams | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sir Peter Hendy | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
SAM MULLINS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.