BEDFORD CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes, Relief of Poverty, Overseas aid/Famine relief. Religious activities. Children/Young people, Elderly/Old People, People with disabilities. People of a particular ethnic or racial origin, General public/Mankind, Provides other finance. Provides human resources, Provides buildings/facilities/open space, Provides services Throughout England & India
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- India
Governance
- 11 July 2007: Standard registration
- BCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARDAR THAPAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARK SAMUEL THAPAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AARON JAMES THAPAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.87k | £79.51k | £36.47k | £51.33k | £40.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.99k | £7.59k | £19.65k | £48.23k | £38.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.20k | £1.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RELIGIOUS AND OTHER EDUCATION. 3) THE RELIEF OF THE AGED, POOR, SICK AND DISABLED. TO RELIEVE NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS IN THE ASIAN AND WORLDWIDE COUNTRIES (IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION) SEE FIT, THROUGH DONATIONS AND AID.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
BEDFORD CHRISTIAN CENTRE
OFFA ROAD
BEDFORD
MK42 9HZ
- Phone:
- 07730783899
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window