ST HELENS SINFONIETTA

Charity number: 1116343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 August 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 15 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 15 November 2019 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 16 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 24 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required