ST HELENS SINFONIETTA

Charity number: 1116343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £23.17k £23.40k £18.99k £15.61k £7.97k
Total expenditure £22.01k £27.70k £21.53k £12.63k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A