Financial history YESHIVAS AHAVAS TORAH

Charity number: 1117332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £24.07k £24.99k £24.71k £24.73k £91.04k
Total expenditure £23.87k £26.83k £26.31k £21.98k £96.91k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A