MAGDALENE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1117079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 July 2020 21 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 July 2020 21 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 19 July 2019 26 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 July 2019 26 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 19 July 2018 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 July 2018 11 October 2018 On time
Annual return 19 July 2017 15 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 July 2017 15 February 2018 On time
Annual return 19 July 2016 16 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 July 2016 16 January 2017 On time