Financial history JAY EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1116458
Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £901.32k £792.56k £969.80k £1.03m £1.29m
Total expenditure £562.86k £606.95k £679.02k £608.89k £978.72k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £101.50k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £901.32k £792.56k £969.80k £1.03m £1.19m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £309.78k £364.60k £430.68k £397.58k £600.16k
Expenditure - Raising funds £253.08k £242.35k £248.33k £211.31k £378.56k
Expenditure - Governance £5.62k £8.00k £8.00k £10.84k £11.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution £208.64k £289.80k £307.62k £350.61k £489.24k
Expenditure - Investment management £253.08k £242.35k £248.33k £211.31k £378.56k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0