ALLIANCE PUBLISHING TRUST

Charity number: 1116744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joel Patrick Toner Trustee 11 September 2020 None on record
Philippe Jannet Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Axelle Guyonne Davezac Trustee 10 January 2019 None on record
Stefan Hendrick Schafers Trustee 13 July 2017 None on record
James Walter Veirs Trustee 02 July 2020 None on record
FELIX OLDENBURG Trustee 13 July 2017 None on record
Elizabeth Ann McKeon Trustee 11 July 2018 None on record