NPPG LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education and training in paediatric and neonatal pharmacy, including the undertaking of research and the provision of information and advice concerning paediatric and neonatal pharmacy for the benefit of the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 January 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABIGAIL MEE | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
DIANA MOWBRAY | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL GOODING | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN RICHARD TOMLIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £185.14k | £178.76k | £173.13k | £114.83k | £175.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.74k | £156.60k | £189.17k | £153.70k | £199.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 February 2025 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 February 2025 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 August 2024 | 280 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 August 2024 | 280 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN PAEDIATRIC AND NEONATAL PHARMACY AND IN PURSUANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE TO FACILITATE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION, PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT AND TRAINING OF PHARMACISTS IN THE PROVISION OF QUALITY PAEDIATRIC AND NEONATAL PHARMACY SERVICES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC. B) THE PROMOTION AND UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH AND AUDIT AND THE PROVISION AND COMMUNICATION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE CONCERNING PAEDIATRIC AND NEONATAL PHARMACY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOUNDARY HOUSE BUSINESS CENTRE LTD
BOUNDARY HOUSE
BOSTON ROAD
LONDON
W7 2QE
- Phone:
- 02037255856
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window