CATALANS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote Catalan culture and activities which facilitate the gathering of Catalan people living in the UK and London in particular.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 January 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pau Josep Artigas Ferret | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carmina Munte Geli | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marta Amigo Batlle | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ENRIQUE ARIAS HOLLENSTEIN | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.46k | £22.17k | £22.27k | £45.03k | £44.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.89k | £22.74k | £16.76k | £45.44k | £55.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2024 | 347 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2024 | 347 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 3 OCTOBER 2006 AND 11 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE CITIZENS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM IN THE CATALAN LANGUAGE, HISTORY, LITERATURE, CULTURE AND TRADITIONS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CATALANS UK
17 FLEET STREET
LONDON
EC4Y 1AA
- Phone:
- 020 7583 4263
- Email:
- info@catalansuk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window