EMPOWER - THE EMERGING MARKETS FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1118916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 26 June 2020 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 26 June 2020 57 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 10 May 2019 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 10 May 2019 10 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 27 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 10 May 2017 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 10 May 2017 10 days late Download