EMPOWER - THE EMERGING MARKETS FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1118916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Colin Reedie Trustee 08 September 2020 None on record
Marc Christopher Balston Trustee 17 June 2013 None on record
Jonathan Neva Bell Trustee 24 February 2020 None on record
Andrew Curran Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
OZAN TARMAN Trustee None on record
Toby Joseph Alan West Trustee 15 June 2020 None on record
Peter Tolhurst Trustee 22 February 2017 None on record
Adeel Ayaz Khan Trustee 01 March 2021 None on record
Pontso Mafethe Trustee 18 June 2014
MAKE EVERY WOMAN COUNT Received: On time
Michael Lekan Trustee 22 February 2017 None on record
Pierre-Yves Bareau Trustee 23 February 2017 None on record
PARVOLETA SHTEREVA Trustee 30 July 2012 None on record
FRANCISCO FERNANDEZ DE YBARRA Trustee 08 August 2011 None on record
BRADLEY JAMES WICKENS Trustee None on record
Kunal Shah Chair 31 October 2016 None on record
Cynthia Steele Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Susan Dodge Trustee 18 February 2019 None on record
Aditi Thorat Trustee 18 June 2014 None on record
Swatee Deepak Trustee 24 February 2020 None on record
JONATHAN ANDREW BAGOT BAYLISS Trustee None on record
Angela Labombarda Trustee 30 November 2017 None on record
JEREMY LLEWELYN Trustee 08 August 2011 None on record
John Patton Trustee 15 June 2020 None on record