Accounts and annual returns THE BECHT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1116657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 03 October 2019 11 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2019 11 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 03 October 2018 31 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2018 31 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 03 October 2017 11 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2017 11 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 03 October 2016 13 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2016 13 July 2017 On time Download Open in new window