Financial history THE BECHT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1116657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/10/2016 03/10/2017 03/10/2018 03/10/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.30m £6.00m £4.84m £6.19m £4.40m
Total expenditure £2.72m £1.88m £2.72m £2.31m £6.14m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.30m £6.00m £4.84m £6.19m £4.40m
Income - Other £0 £1.06m £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.56m £1.75m £2.28m £1.25m £5.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £144.90k £126.97k £440.76k £1.06m £1.12m
Expenditure - Governance £19.82k £27.75k £52.75k £108.25k £59.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.54m £1.72m £2.22m £1.14m £4.73m
Expenditure - Investment management £144.90k £126.97k £440.76k £1.06m £1.12m
Expenditure - Other £9.46k £0 £0 £0 £0