CATALYST URBAN TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The transformation of deprived communities through C.O.A.C.H. (Creating Opportunities And Casting Hope). C.O.A.C.H. is a four-fold strategy for community transformation: C.O.A.C.H. - Community Mentoring C.O.A.C.H. - Community Leadership C.O.A.C.H. - Urban Toolkit C.O.A.C.H. - Community Resources Our aim: a well evaluated model that has Local Impact and National Significance.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2009
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Llundain Fwyaf
Llywodraethu
- 14 Rhagfyr 2006: Cofrestrwyd
- 25 Gorffennaf 2012: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- CATALYST TRUST (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £163.56k | £163.56k | £175.83k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £165.14k | £165.14k | £221.56k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2011 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2011 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2010 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2010 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2009 | 20 Hydref 2010 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2009 | 30 Medi 2010 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2008 | 13 Tachwedd 2009 | 13 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2008 | 09 Hydref 2009 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 2 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED 7 SEPTEMBER 2006
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING (BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY MEANS OF DEVELOPING THE CAPACITIES AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND (B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND (C) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (D) TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE THROUGH CONCILIATION FOR FAMILIES AND/OR MEMBERS OF DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES WHOSE RELATIONSHIPS APPEAR TO BE BREAKING DOWN AND, WHERE SUCH RELATIONSHIPS HAVE ALREADY BROKEN DOWN, TO ADVISE AND HELP IN THE SETTLEMENT OF DIFFERENCES; AND (E) TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window