Accounts and annual returns CONGREGATION SHAREI SHOLOM TCHABE LIMITED

Charity number: 1116596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 March 2022 22 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 March 2022 22 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 March 2021 23 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 March 2021 23 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 March 2020 23 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 March 2020 23 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 March 2019 01 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 March 2019 01 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 March 2018 06 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 March 2018 06 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window