Financial history CONGREGATION SHAREI SHOLOM TCHABE LIMITED

Charity number: 1116596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/03/2018 29/03/2019 29/03/2020 29/03/2021 29/03/2022
Total gross income £779.62k £998.29k £984.20k £1.72m £2.18m
Total expenditure £779.07k £880.48k £886.50k £1.94m £2.25m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £777.12k £998.29k £984.20k £1.72m £2.18m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.50k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £768.67k £870.08k £886.50k £1.94m £2.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £739 £618 £2.04k £5.75k £9.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £767.93k £869.46k £812.10k £1.66m £2.15m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £10.40k £10.40k £0 £838 £0