ZINDGANI (ASIAN MEN'S GROUP)

Charity number: 1117699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.09k £7.70k £14.75k £7.01k £4.83k
Total expenditure £9.99k £8.90k £152.21k £8.71k £5.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A