NO SIZE FITS ALL PRODUCTIONS LIMITED

Charity number: 1117029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £258.85k £258.85k £323.69k £237.17k £235.69k
Total expenditure £250.86k £250.86k £285.10k £267.13k £221.36k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.90k N/A N/A N/A £185.24k