FRIENDS OF INTERNATIONAL HOUSE NEW YORK CITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organisation of events in order to encourage donations from attendees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 May 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA KEIKO HAMZAHEE | Chair |
|
||||||||
Emily Rose Simons | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Veronique Ehamo | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Patrick Stephan von Aulock | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Ayman Jarjour | Trustee | 13 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
ALYSON KING | Trustee | 13 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
ERIKA TERESA HOWARD | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||
TOMAS HAZLETON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MAMI URANO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170 | £180 | £4.26k | £240 | £240 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £0 | £4.47k | £360 | £256 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 14 May 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 26 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AND PROVIDING THEM WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO LIVE AND LEARN AT INTERNATIONAL HOUSE, AN INDEPENDENT NON-PROFIT GRADUATE STUDENT ORGANISATION BASED IN NEW YORK CITY. OUR AIM IS TO NURTURE AN EDUCATIONAL ENVIRONMENT THROUGH SUPPORT OF PROGRAMMES, LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES, NETWORKING AND OTHER COMMUNITY AND CULTURAL EVENTS FOR BOTH STUDENTS AND ALUMNI OF INTERNATIONAL HOUSE, WHEREBY THEY LEARN QUALITIES OF LEADERSHIP, TOLERANCE, RESPECT AND FRIENDSHIP AMONG INDIVIDUALS OF ALL NATIONS AND BACKGROUNDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
F23 Du Cane Court
Balham High Road
Balham
London
United Kingdom
SW17 7JN
- Phone:
- 44 (0) 7802756256
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window