Financial history BURY PARK EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1118199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £520.03k £641.12k £771.55k £986.95k £996.47k
Total expenditure £700.75k £796.99k £932.84k £1.66m £1.35m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £211.74k £115.54k
Income - Donations and legacies £13.66k £12.62k £0 £14.71k £28.13k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £628.50k £771.55k £972.24k £968.34k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £506.36k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £698.35k £796.99k £895.52k £1.66m £1.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.40k £2.40k £2.40k £2.73k £5.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £37.32k £0 £0