Accounts and annual returns BEARWOOD COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 April 2022 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 April 2022 169 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 December 2020 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 December 2020 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 December 2019 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 18 December 2019 48 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window