Financial history BEARWOOD COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £36.70k £61.16k £81.39k £71.23k £50.76k
Total expenditure £39.90k £61.24k £57.44k £58.66k £67.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £27.00k £24.80k