Financial history AGE UK HERTFORDSHIRE

Charity number: 1116662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.81m £3.90m £3.66m £3.47m £3.64m
Total expenditure £3.48m £3.55m £3.62m £3.51m £3.36m
Income from government contracts £540.66k £560.08k £619.81k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.03m £1.05m £1.07m £1.56m £1.60m
Income - Donations and legacies £89.09k £387.85k £88.22k £142.80k £117.80k
Income - Other trading activities £155.83k £12.89k £19.40k £11.16k £15.05k
Income - Charitable activities £3.56m £3.50m £3.54m £3.31m £3.50m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.70k £6.05k £8.51k £2.78k £715
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £62.11k £361.41k £44.87k £93.96k £600
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.40m £3.52m £3.58m £3.45m £3.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £73.81k £25.42k £42.78k £62.89k £15.44k
Expenditure - Governance £22.95k £46.44k £26.39k £16.87k £17.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0