Accounts and annual returns BOWEL DISEASE UK

Charity number: 1117241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required