Financial history BOWEL DISEASE UK

Charity number: 1117241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £13.27k £50.06k £6.79k £2.94k £91.60k
Total expenditure £84.72k £87.52k £1.27k £7.75k £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A