HIGH VIEW PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1117453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 20 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required