JIGSAW KIDS MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activity is to provide for the refief of children and their families living in conditions of need, hardship or distress in south east asia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
- Philippines
Governance
- 01 November 2006: Standard registration
- JIGSAW (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHRYN ANN LEE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ELISABETH CRUTCHLEY | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jason Gosling | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Gosling | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEVE CONLEY | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PRICE | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY DENNIS LEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.27k | £107.60k | £139.34k | £122.09k | £128.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.71k | £114.35k | £140.76k | £116.60k | £123.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2022
(These accounts |
19 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10/07/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES LIVING IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN SOUTH EAST ASIA.
Area of benefit
SOUTH EAST ASIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stonecheck
Milnthorpe
Cumbria
LA7 7QZ
- Phone:
- 01480380158
- Email:
- jigsawkidsuk@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window