BEN AMRAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1116847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 08 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 08 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 04 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 04 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 06 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 06 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 20 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 08 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 08 September 2017 On time Download