CHRIST CHURCH COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENTS

Charity number: 1116829
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 06 August 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 06 August 2021 7 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 26 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 31 July 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 12 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 12 July 2017 On time Download