CHRIST CHURCH COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENTS

Charity number: 1116829
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £29.09k £12.65k £3.90k £4.26k £57.52k
Total expenditure £13.70k £13.36k £6.60k £6.48k £51.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £55.00k