FRIENDS OF ST ANNE'S (OVER HADDON) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1117184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 25 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 24 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 26 June 2018 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 09 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required