FRIENDS OF ST ANNE'S (OVER HADDON) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1117184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £1.45k £1.18k £1.46k £2.77k £3.39k
Total expenditure £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A