Financial history AL ATHARIYYAH

Charity number: 1116996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £129.49k £100.58k £73.74k £122.87k £92.60k
Total expenditure £35.88k £47.79k £66.80k £57.64k £53.88k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A