FURRY TAILS FELINE WELFARE

Charity number: 1118124
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 November 2020 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 November 2020 29 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 December 2019 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 December 2019 44 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 February 2018 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 13 February 2018 105 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 29 December 2016 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 29 December 2016 59 days late Download