FURRY TAILS FELINE WELFARE

Charity number: 1118124
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £70.67k £66.72k £61.37k £64.32k £88.06k
Total expenditure £66.80k £68.71k £60.19k £66.01k £73.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A