SAFE PASSAGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Safe Passage raises money to help fund the education of children living in the Guatemala City Garbage Dump. All money raised contributes to an educational programme which currently supports approximately 500 of Guatemala's most disadvantaged children. As well as an education, these children receive daily meals, food parcels, medical and social care for their whole family.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Guatemala
Governance
- 15 December 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER JAMES WIGAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr FRANCESCA CLEUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HENRY MCNEILL SHELFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.73k | £8.12k | £9.52k | £7.00k | £7.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.55k | £5.63k | £17.58k | £6.76k | £6.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 June 2024 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHILDREN ATTENDING SAFE PASSAGE IN GUATEMALA CITY, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE PROJECT, AND TO PROVIDE RELIEF FROM POVERTY, SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE AND DEPRIVATION.
Area of benefit
GUATEMALA CITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
65 The Glade
Fetcham
Leatherhead
Surrey
KT22 9TF
- Phone:
- 07812576682
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window