LITTLE ANGELS TRUST

Charity number: 1126333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 13 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 22 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required